LONDON DEBRE SEMAYAT MEDHANEALEM AND ST. GABRIEL ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Administration of the Holy Liturgy and other Sacraments Public worship, prayer, Bible study, preaching and teaching Evangelical and missionary activities Sunday School Nurture preachers of the Kingdom of God Holy Gospel Education and training activities f Pastoral care Charitable social actions in the UK and abroad Encouraging relationships with other Christian communities in the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 September 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Archdeacon Hitsanemariam Tilahun Sisay | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Samuel Kassa Ferede | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ermias Alemu | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Kedeste-Selassie Negatu | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Semegne Alemayehu | Trustee |
|
||||||
Birhan Dagne | Trustee |
|
||||||
Haragewoyn Mengesha | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 22 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH (THE “OBJECTS”) ARE TO ADVANCE THE ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND REGULATIONS OF THE ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH ATTACHED HERETO BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING:- (1) PROPAGATING THE GOSPEL OF CHRIST; (2) PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING PLACES OF PUBLIC WORSHIP AND THE DUE PERFORMANCE OF THE RITES OF PRAYERS, LITURGY, BAPTISM, MARRIAGE AND BURIAL ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH; (3) PROVIDING FOR THE WELFARE OF THE POOR, COUNSELLING SERVICES, VISITING THE SICK AND IMPRISONED AND TO PRAY FOR THE LIVING, THE DEAD AND THE WHOLE WORLD; (4) TEACHING AND EDUCATING MEMBERS OF THE ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO BELIEVERS AND OTHERS IN THE DOCTRINE AND PRACTICES OF THE CHURCH; (5) RECEIVING AND BAPTISING ALL THOSE WHO FREELY DECIDE TO ADOPT THE ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHRISTIAN FAITH AND LIVE THROUGH ITS SPIRITUAL AND MORAL TEACHING; (6) PROVIDING CULTURAL AND LANGUAGE PROGRAMMES IN ORDER TO INCREASE UNDERSTANDING OF HISTORY, CULTURE, LANGUAGE AND VALUES OF ETHIOPIA PARTICULARLY AMONG THE YOUTH; (7) PROVIDING CHARITABLE SERVICES TO THOSE IN NEED AS WELL AS MAKING CONTRIBUTIONS DURING AN EMERGENCY OR DISASTER AND ENCOURAGING VOLUNTEERING WORK AMONG ITS BELIEVERS; AND (8) THE PROVISION OF A MONASTERY WHICH WILL KEEP AND PRESERVE THE HOLY MONASTIC LIFE PRACTICED BY THE ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JOHNS CHURCH
NORTH END ROAD
LONDON
SW6 1PB
- Phone:
- 07832186359
- Email:
- ldsmedhanealem@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window