HAYDON BRIDGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity owns, maintains and runs the Haydon Bridge Community Centre. This includes organising the hire of the premises by community groups, educational and social organisations and for recreational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 12 May 1966: Standard registration
- HAYDON BRIDGE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY DOUTHWAITE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Avril Rosemary Kirsopp | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN BELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
VALERIE BELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.87k | £41.19k | £19.66k | £14.18k | £16.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.25k | £23.44k | £16.72k | £24.94k | £21.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.30k | £27.18k | £4.75k | £5.00k | £5.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 OCTOBER 1968
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HAYDON BRIDGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANIZATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
HAYDON BRIDGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
LANEFOOT
LANGLEY-ON-TYNE
HEXHAM
NE47 5ND
- Phone:
- 01434684705
- Email:
- valeriebell2@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window