BAITULMAAL FOR GLOBAL RELIEF

Charity number: 1205016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

BGR will work towards improving the quality of life for individuals and communities by addressing specific needs, such as access to education, healthcare, food, shelter and social support. BGR will provide opportunities for individuals to acquire new skills, gain knowledge, and develop self-reliance, enabling them to overcome challenges and improve their circumstances.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 October 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Huma Ali Trustee 11 January 2025
AL-HASANAAT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Muhammad Jahanzab Trustee 07 May 2024
RIGHT PATH ACADEMY
Received: On time
AL-HASANAAT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ALI ANWAR Trustee 02 October 2023
AL-HASANAAT FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2024
Total gross income £0
Total expenditure £0
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 11 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 11 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
34
Gladstone Avenue
Manor Park
LONDON
Phone:
00447946155132
Website:

No information available