GLOBAL RUGBY PLAYERS' FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Global Rugby Players Foundation seeks to empower rugby players, who contributed to the success of the game, to have a healthy and fulfilling life after they leave it. It seeks to reframe the concept of retirement by looking at it as a positive challenge and an opportunity for people to forge new careers, build new connections and expand their identity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Fiji
- France
- Ireland
- Italy
- Japan
- New Zealand
- Romania
- Samoa
- South Africa
- Tonga
- United States
Governance
- 11 September 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Musarurwa Gregan | Chair | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Frank | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID QUINLAN | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL WILLIAM CARTER ONZM | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sir WILLIAM BLACKLEDGE BEAUMONT CBE | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1.1 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND ILL-HEALTH, AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF RETIRED PLAYERS BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE; 3.1.2 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR UNEMPLOYMENT AMONG RETIRED PLAYERS BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND SKILLS TRAINING AND OTHER SUCH SUPPORT TO ASSIST THEM IN GENERATING A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BECOMING SELF-SUFFICIENT OR ASSIST THEM IN FINDING EMPLOYMENT; 3.1.3 TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES, WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON FURTHERING PURPOSES WHICH ADDRESS THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF RETIRED PLAYERS, AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME. 3.2 IN CLAUSE 3.1 RETIRED PLAYERS MEANS MEN AND WOMEN WHO HAVE: 3.2.1 BEEN EMPLOYED TO PLAY THE SPORT OF RUGBY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD; 3.2.2 PLAYED THE SPORT OF RUGBY AT THE TOP TIER OF DOMESTIC COMPETITION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD (WHETHER OR NOT THEY WERE PAID); 3.2.3 REPRESENTED THEIR NATION AT THE SPORT OF RUGBY IN SENIOR RUGBY WORLD CUP (XVS) OR WORLD SERIES (7S) COMPETITION (WHETHER OR NOT THEY WERE PAID); OR 3.2.4 REPRESENTED THEIR NATION AT THE SPORT OF RUGBY IN SENIOR INTERNATIONAL COMPETITION (WHETHER OR NOT THEY WERE PAID). 3.3 IN THIS CLAUSE 3, ‘RUGBY’ MEANS THE SPORT OF RUGBY UNION PLAYED PURSUANT TO LAWS, REGULATIONS AND BYELAWS ISSUED BY WORLD RUGBY FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 LINCOLN'S INN FIELDS
LONDON
WC2A 3LH
- Phone:
- 02033757000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window