ST FRANCIS OF ASSISI PRIMARY SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The St Francis of Assisi Primary School Charity exists to break down barriers and allow children to thrive regardless of their circumstances. We provide life-changing opportunities alongside emotional support for our families and children. Our work is not statutory - it helps children and families outside the classroom whilst working directly with the school to sustain trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCESCA NELSON-SMITH | Chair | 13 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Alexis Le Moine | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Williams | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|||||
John Asgian | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF THE PUPILS AT ST FRANCIS OF ASSISI PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, RESOURCES AND FACILITIES [NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY] FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. FRANCIS PRIMARY SCHOOL
TREADGOLD STREET
LONDON
W11 4BJ
- Phone:
- 02077278523
- Email:
- charity@franassisi.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window