BRANDON & WOLSTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of the village hall is for the use of the inhabitant of Brandon, Wolston and surrounding area without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for: (a)meetings, lecture and classes and (b) other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 10 August 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Carney | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Tyler | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Ralph | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Wright | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Thompson | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janette Owen | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Rainey | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracie Ball | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Lord | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03 JUL 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF BRANDON AND WOLSTON AND SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURE AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 MAIN STREET
WOLSTON
COVENTRY
CV8 3HJ
- Phone:
- 02475018773
- Email:
- bookings.bwvh@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window