MIDDLETON AND TODRIDGE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Village Hall is used by the neighbourhood to provide a warm, convenient and comfortable place for community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 29 August 1962: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY GEORGE COURTICE | Chair | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
CORINNA WADDELL | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
ERNEST COE | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILKINSON | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
KATE FREEMAN | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WILLIAM MILLER | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER HUGHES | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
COLIN SNOWBALL | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
ELSIE GREEN | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.87k | £20.47k | £10.43k | £6.56k | £8.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.90k | £6.76k | £10.38k | £5.39k | £14.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £34.10k | £17.27k | £2.89k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 11 NOVEMBER 1961
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
VILLAGES OF MIDDLETON AND TODRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Rothwell Road
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 1TY
- Phone:
- 07855444719
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window