DAVID AND PAT MCCALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1203934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity holds an initial fund of £25,000 to be used towards general charitable purposes. From these funds trustees will make grants to deserving causes or activities. Grants will be available to any applicant deemed to be worthy of support, It is anticipated that the majority of grants made by the trust will be to other established charities, non charitable organisations and individuals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £31,507
Total expenditure: £2,808

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 July 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karl David Pocock Trustee 10 August 2023
None on record
Michael John Hughes Trustee 19 April 2023
None on record
ROBERT EDWARD COLLIN Trustee 19 April 2023
None on record
David Slesser McCall CBE DL Trustee 19 April 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.51k
Total expenditure £2.81k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PO Box 3813
Cannon Wharf
Norwich
NR7 7ND
Phone:
01603699871
Website:

No information available