OTTERBURN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise money by fundraising and charging fees for use of the Hall, to ensure we can maintain the building and its fabric, cover running costs e.g. fuel, light, rates insurance & caretakers wages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 29 May 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YASMIN OLIVER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lisa Murray | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Corbett | Trustee | 31 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.75k | £12.62k | £15.52k | £16.96k | £10.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.32k | £2.26k | £6.25k | £11.19k | £29.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | £11.30k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 07 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 19TH APRIL 1960
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
OTTERBURN AN THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Brierley Gardens
Otterburn
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE19 1HB
- Phone:
- 07879992175
- Email:
- treasurer.omh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window