SELBY DISTRICT SCOUTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting exists to actively engage and support young people in their personal development, empowering them to make a positive contribution to society. Selby District Scouts provides activities directly to young people aged 14-25, and supports Scout Groups and volunteers across the wider Selby area who work directly with young people aged between 4 and 14 years old.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
160 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 13 September 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Hyland | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Sedman | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Shipstone | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Farley | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Martin Stockill | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sean Hick | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carl Gibson | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Powell | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Cartwright | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04 JAN 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL; AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Toll House
Hill Top
Barlby
SELBY
North Yorkshire
YO8 5JQ
- Phone:
- 01757 210578
- Email:
- info@selbyscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window