PRESTON GRANGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mother and Toddlers Group,Youth Club,2 Retired Gentlemens Clubs,Art Group,Keep Fit Classes,Tap/Salsa Group,Tuesday Ladies Club,Wine Club,Canoe Club,Preston Grange Community Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 09 April 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Thompson | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Brain | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Young | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNE NICHOLSON | Trustee | 05 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
BETTY FLINT | Trustee | 05 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALLAN FLINT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.65k | £15.15k | £15.41k | £19.85k | £19.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.23k | £18.90k | £5.65k | £14.67k | £22.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.59k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 246 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | 06 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 MARCH 1966
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PRESTON GRANGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES , VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
PRESTON GRANGE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Preston Grange Community Centre
Newington Drive
NORTH SHIELDS
Tyne And Wear
NE29 9JA
- Phone:
- 01912587608
- Email:
- allan.flint35@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window