SLALEY COMMEMORATION HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide and manage a village hall as a venue for various activities and events, predominantly, but not exclusively, for the benefit of the residents of the Parish of Slaley, Hexham, Northumberland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,665 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 27 May 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Bailey | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Elphick | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jacques | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip James Cain | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Brewis-Levie | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stella Douglas | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Carol Ferguson | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAT WILSON | Trustee | 25 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Isabel Rowell | Trustee | 25 November 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.57k | £92.37k | £94.59k | £54.79k | £30.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.88k | £84.02k | £20.35k | £147.63k | £48.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.24k | £20.67k | N/A | £11.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 17 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SLALEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lawn House
Slaley
HEXHAM
Northumberland
NE47 0AS
- Phone:
- 01434673388
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window