COURT MEADOW GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides equestrian services to children and young adults with a mental or physical disability in West and East Sussex in order for them to gain therapeutic benefit and have the opportunity to achieve. The core purpose is to benefit the health and wellbeing of our riders and give them the opportunity to learn new skills, and achieve personal goals and ambitions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 June 2023: CIO registration
- 27 October 2023: Funds received from 1073675 COURT MEADOW GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIA...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Dolly Hunton | Chair | 22 July 2010 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Black | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Strong | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Walker | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Entwisle | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Parnell | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Karkia | Trustee | 04 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Malins | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WELCH | Trustee | 21 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Susan Hawkins | Trustee | 04 July 2006 |
|
|
||||
Susan Coote | Trustee | 06 July 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 26 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE WEST/EAST SUSSEX AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROUGHWOODS
HIGH STREET
BALCOMBE
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH17 6JY
- Phone:
- 03002010039
- Email:
- mail@courtmeadow-rda.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window