WEST WALTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Craft Clubs, friendship Club, Dog Clubs, Bingo, Keep Fit, Lady's Group, Parish Council Meetings and Elections
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 30 October 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David William Salter | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Jayne Salter | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Corinne Yvette Greatholder | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Ann Kidger | Trustee | 09 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Roberts | Trustee |
|
||||||
Angela Elizabeth Roberts | Trustee |
|
||||||
Sylvia Louise Violet Hobbs | Trustee |
|
||||||
George Charles Edward Greatholder | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WEST WALTON (“AREA OF BENEFIT”) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS (THE “OBJECTS”).
Contact information
- Address:
-
West Walton Village Hall
Mill Road
West Walton
WISBECH
PE14 7EU
- Phone:
- 01945589508
- Email:
- hilary.kidger@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.