THE MAKE WAY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Make Way Foundation funds the purchase of wheelchairs and other mobility equipment for children with disabilities in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fleur-Louise Bryant | Chair | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Bryant | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Sibley | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Jones | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £232.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
3) OBJECTS THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES WITH DISABILITIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WHEELCHAIRS, OTHER MOBILITY AIDS AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT TO MEET THEIR HEALTH NEEDS AND TO RELIEVE THE OTHER NEEDS (INCLUDING MENTAL HEALTH NEEDS) OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES WITH DISABILITIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE SUPPORT, SERVICES, EQUIPMENT OR RESOURCES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abbey House
25 Clarendon Road
REDHILL
RH1 1QZ
- Phone:
- 01737949140
- Email:
- info@makewayfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window