SHARE SKIPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Share Skipton aims to create a more sustainable, sharing Skipton by setting up and running a library of things, repair cafes and other initiatives promoting sharing and a circular economy. We are volunteer-led and rely on donations of things for our library. A library of things enables people to borrow useful items at low cost, which helps reduce consumption, waste, use of resources, and CO2.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,100 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
- City Of York
- Lancashire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 16 August 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Monaghan DL | Chair | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Dootson | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Winstanley | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Powell | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Protheroe | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SKIPTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT BY WORKING FOR REDUCTIONS IN GREENHOUSE GAS EMISSIONS, RAW MATERIAL USE, AND MANUFACTURING WASTE THROUGH THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF COMMUNITY RESOURCE SHARING, RE-USE AND REPAIR INITIATIVES; AND (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUSTAINABLE LIVING AND A CIRCULAR OR ?REGENERATIVE? ECONOMY IN SKIPTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COMMUNICATIONS, EVENTS AND INFORMATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
91 Raikes Road
SKIPTON
North Yorkshire
BD23 1LS
- Phone:
- 07378 508751
- Email:
- hello@shareskipton.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window