BUKHMAN FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity will carry out activities for the public benefit to provide relief by such means as are charitable, for children and adults, by the provision of grants in relation to: poverty; education; religion; health or saving lives; citizenship or community development; the arts, culture, heritage or science; amateur sport; human rights; the environment; animal welfare; and rescue services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2025
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 November 2023: Standard registration
- BUKHMAN FAMILY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Igor Bukhman | Chair | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anastasia Bukhman | Trustee | 25 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Grigorii Naukhatskii | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 02 OCT 2023 as amended on 21 Jun 2024 as amended on 24 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
SUBJECT TO THE FOLLOWING PROVISIONS, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 NORWICH STREET
LONDON
EC4A 1BD
- Phone:
- 07440497025
- Email:
- foundation@rix.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.