BEMBRIDGE FORT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conferences, lectures are open to anyone who wishes to attend; they may take place in Bembridge Fort or if needed off site. The content of the talks will take into account the aims and objectives of the Trust. Covering all aspects of fortifications on and around the Isle of Wight.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 11 August 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID REEVES | Chair | 11 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Ashley James Webb | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leah Margaret Mew | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Richard Wander | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Sutton | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Boswell | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £210 | |
|
Total expenditure | £160 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE HISTORIC BUILDING KNOWN AS BEMBRIDGE FORT LOCATED ON THE ISLE OF WIGHT, ALONGSIDE OTHER FORTIFICATIONS ON AND AROUND THE ISLE OF WIGHT THAT ARE OF SIGNIFICANT HISTORIC VALUE. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF BEMBRIDGE FORT (AND OTHER FORTIFICATIONS ON AND AROUND THE ISLE OF WIGHT THAT ARE OF SIGNIFICANT HISTORIC VALUE) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, LECTURES, WORKSHOPS, CONFERENCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Landguard Manor
Landguard Manor Road
Shanklin
- Phone:
- 07775606812
- Email:
- dreeves@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window