BRAMCOTE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a Village Hall for rental of the three various sized halls available for use by all the community in all sorts of activities associated with village halls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 21 November 1963: Standard registration
- BRAMCOTE MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Maria Tavener | Chair | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lilian Morley | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Jones | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA ANN CHAMBERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.43k | £35.42k | £47.59k | £55.21k | £60.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.86k | £33.16k | £35.50k | £48.52k | £52.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.34k | £10.89k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEEDS DATED 26 SEPTEMBER 1923 AND 24 AUGUST 1925
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
BRAMCOTE
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 Wellington Street
Long Eaton
NOTTINGHAM
NG10 4NF
- Phone:
- 07926057201
- Email:
- alex.tavener1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window