Financial history THE BURTON JOYCE AND BULCOTE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £29.35k £27.65k £32.21k £34.42k £28.19k
Total expenditure £26.02k £17.63k £23.60k £30.53k £40.16k
Income from government contracts N/A £450 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.90k £23.40k £2.67k £1.54k N/A