THE FRIENDS OF COMEYTROWE POND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to protect, conserve and improve the wildlife and natural environment of Comeytrowe pond for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 10 August 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tina Lareen Rabjohns | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY BISSON | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Arnica Bickerstaff | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Jane Osborne | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Christian Skyner | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Ellett-Murrant | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Murrant | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Frederick John Sidaway | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £455 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROTECT, CONSERVE AND IMPROVE THE WILDLIFE AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF COMEYTROWE POND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Stone Close
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA1 4YG
- Phone:
- 07875363043
- Email:
- jeremysidaway60@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window