Accounts and annual returns EPPERSTONE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522215
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2008 10 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2007 14 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2006 25 July 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2005 11 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not Required