Financial history MAPPERLEY PLAINS RECREATION AND SOCIAL CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 522218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £108.53k £99.80k £149.10k £156.69k £141.97k
Total expenditure £84.44k £79.37k £88.11k £145.69k £209.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A