The Orthodox Ukrainian Parish of Protection of the Mother of God
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 March 2024: CIO registration
- THE ORTHODOX PARISH OF THE UKRAINIAN CHURCH OF THE PROTECTION OF THE HOLY MOTHER OF GOD (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Myroslav Pushkaruk | Chair | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roman Zahasaylo | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olesia Dudko | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valentyna Povstyan | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Mar 2024 as amended on 30 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX FAITH AND TRADITIONS AMONG THE UKRAINIAN SPEAKING COMMUNITY IN LONDON AND ACROSS GREAT BRITAIN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: * THE PROVISION OF MINISTRY AND CANONICAL SERVICES CONDUCTED ACCORDING TO THE ORDER OF THE GREAT CHURCH OF CONSTANTINOPLE BY A CANONICAL PRIEST, PREFERABLY OF THE ORTHODOX CHURCH OF UKRAINE AND THROUGH SERMONS AND CATECHISM IN THE UKRAINIAN LANGUAGE. * ESTABLISHING SUNDAY SCHOOLS AND BIBLE CLASSES TO TEACH THE ORTHODOX FAITH AND RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF RELIGIOUS BELIEFS AND PRACTICES WHOLLY OR MAINLY IN THE UKRAINIAN LANGUAGE. * PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AS A PRACTICAL EXPRESSION OF THE CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 1, MORTLAKE HOUSE
512 CHISWICK HIGH ROAD
LONDON
W4 5RH
- Phone:
- 07459076256
- Email:
- omiroslaw@ukr.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.