REDDUCK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 September 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Imogen Rae Holliday | Chair |
|
|
|||||
James David Holliday | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Megan Sita McInerney | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Alfred Reuben Mcconnell | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Liam Thomas Hansell | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Elizabeth Meriel Douglas | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH IN PARTICULAR FOR THOSE AFFLICTED BY HUMAN HERPES VIRUS 6 (HHV6) BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS, SUPPORT FOR THOSE AFFECTED BY THE CONDITION, AND CAMPAIGNING, AND; THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH BY PROVIDING GRANT FUNDING FOR REFERRALS FOR HOLISTIC COMPLEMENTARY THERAPIES AND PALLIATIVE CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 GILFORD ROAD
DEAL
CT14 7DJ
- Phone:
- 07851548173
- Email:
- imogen@redduckcampaign.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window