NEWSTEAD COLLIERY MINERS' WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Newstead Miners' Welfare Trust is at the forefront of social and economic regeneration in an area high on the indices of local deprivation. Primary activities include: Cafe; social meeting; training, office and conference facilities; fully internet linked IT Suite; access to local service providers including local councils, and drop-in facilities for Job Club and other community support services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £17,465 from 5 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 20 June 1979: Standard registration
- NEWSTEAD MINERS WELFARE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Graham Dendle | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Donald Reynolds | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Winter | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Smailes | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Johnston | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Leadbeater | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Kay Leadbeater | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.20k | £119.20k | £106.62k | £141.48k | £147.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.82k | £66.43k | £115.12k | £173.41k | £168.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.85k | £97.80k | £42.14k | £18.64k | £17.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 10TH JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROVISION OF AN INSTITUTE AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY)OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 2 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY, (3) IN SO FAR AS THE LAND AND BUILDINGS IN PART 2 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME, OR OTHER ASSETS OF THE CHARITY, ARE NOT REQUIRED FOR THE SAID OBJECT IN (1) ABOVE, THEN PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE CONSULTED AND OBTAINED THE AGREEMENT OF THE TRUSTEES OF CISWO IN ADVANCE, THE TRUSTEES MAY USE THE CHARITY'S LAND AND OTHER ASSETS FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AT LAW FOR THE DIRECT BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NEWSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEWSTEAD COMMUNITY CENTRE
TILFORD ROAD
NEWSTEAD VILLAGE
NOTTS
NG15 0BS
- Phone:
- 01623720140
- Email:
- admin@newsteadcentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window