ALLIANCE FOR WOMEN AND GIRLS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity aims to promote gender equality and assist women and girls in Africa. We achieve this by supporting voluntary organizations working towards improving the lives of women and girls in Africa through advice, resources, training, grants, and skill development. We also provide educational courses and knowledge-sharing networks to leaders of these organizations.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Burkina Faso
- Cameroon
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Malawi
- Nigeria
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- Togo
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 08 December 2023: Standard registration
- AFWAG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aisha Muhammed-Oyebode | Chair | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antonio Belgrave | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 MAY 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 DEC 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN AFRICA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING ADVICE, RESOURCES AND TRAINING, SOURCING AND PROVIDING GRANTS AND PROVIDING OTHER SUCH SUPPORT TO VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS TO SUPPORT THEM IN: (A) ELIMINATING DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF GENDER; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THESE OBJECTS, “VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS” MEANS INDEPENDENT NON-GOVERNMENTAL NOT-FOR-PROFIT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
167-169 Great Portland Street
London, England
W1W 5PF
- Phone:
- 07455862542
- Email:
- Info@afwag.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.