URGENT PROJECTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Urgent Projects is a charitable aid delivery service that provides urgent humanitarian aid to those who require it
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Israel
- Ukraine
Governance
- 10 August 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eka Vekua | Chair | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rodion Shishkov | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eugene Valery Matveichuk | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lenka Chubuklieva | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 MAR 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 JUN 2023 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 JUN 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, IN EACH CASE ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (I) TO ASSIST WITH HUMANITARIAN AND/ OR ENVIRONMENTAL EMERGENCIES AND DISASTERS, WHETHER MAN-MADE OR NATURAL, TO ENSURE THAT ASSISTANCE AND FUNDING IS PROVIDED QUICKLY AT TIMES OF CRISIS, CONFLICT OR DISASTER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE; AND (II) TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION AND CARE OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PERSONS, YOUTHS AND OTHER VULNERABLE PERSONS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD (WITHOUT DIFFERENTIATION ON THE GROUND OF RACE, GENDER, COLOUR, NATIONALITY, SEXUALITY OR OTHERWISE) WHO HAVE BEEN ABDUCTED, GONE MISSING, TAKEN HOSTAGE OR HAVE BEEN OTHERWISE EXPLOITED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fourth Floor
32 St. James's Street
London
United Kingdom
SW1A 1HD
- Phone:
- +447377643325
- Email:
- info@urgent.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window