PONTYPRIDD FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide emergency food parcels to clients in need who have been referred to us by partner referral agencies. We provide access to information and signposting to relevant services and organisations who can assist. As part of the Trussell Trust national network of foodbanks we also campaign for policy change to prevent the need for emergency food aid.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £540 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 17 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Anne Pearce | Chair | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Adrian Pritchard | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carole Helena Jones | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Ann Davies | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Morgan | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA MINTON | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Raymond George Minton | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £540 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PONTYPRIDD AND SURROUNDING AREAS, PRIMARILY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD, BUT ALSO RELATED ADDITIONAL SERVICES, ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT FOR THOSE IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RIVERSIDE CENTRE
NILE STREET
PONTYPRIDD
CF37 1BW
- Phone:
- 01443404692
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window