Financial history HARVEY HADDEN STADIUM

Charity number: 522271
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £117.40k £117.40k £108.57k £117.40k £135.11k
Total expenditure £117.40k £117.40k £108.57k £117.40k £135.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £71.82k £75.41k £93.29k £74.70k £95.59k