THE RUSSELL YOUTH CLUB, NOTTINGHAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Club Providing various activites including table tenis, basketball, football, badminton, trampolining, dance sessions, drama, dj-ing, rapping, sexual health information, refugee and asylum seekers groups, cafe sessions, self defence, beauty therapy and trips to various locations throughout school holidays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 16 July 1962: Standard registration
- 28 November 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.11k | £17.46k | £23.38k | £20.99k | £20.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.56k | £18.83k | £27.85k | £21.38k | £22.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 07 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 16 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 20 July 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 19 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF BOYS AND YOUNG MEN AND GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN THROUGH THEIR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO HELP THEM ACHIEVE THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window