CHURCH OF GOD MISSION INTERNATIONAL (SHEFFIELD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the Christian faith for the public benefit in accordance with the Statement of Faith in Sheffield and in such other parts of the United Kingdom and the world as the trustees may decide through the holding of prayer meetings and Bible study, raising awareness of religious beliefs and practices, celebrating religious festivals, evangelism, outreach, and pastoral care in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 September 2023: CIO registration
- CGMI SOLUTION CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Tolu Fianka | Chair | 05 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nmesomachi Chukwuemeka Nwosu | Trustee | 05 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Omorogiuwa Madunagu | Trustee | 05 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
ADVANCING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN SHEFFIELD AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS AND BIBLE STUDY, RAISING AWARENESS OF RELIGIOUS BELIEFS AND PRACTICES, CELEBRATING RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, EVANGELISM, OUTREACH AND PASTORAL CARE IN THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Broomhall Centre
Broomspring Lane
Sheffield
S10 2FD
- Phone:
- 07707530262
- Email:
- cgmisheffield@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window