Financial history ORSTON VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 522283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £19.63k £1.69k £7.14k £9.81k £10.88k
Total expenditure £9.81k £5.49k £13.55k £11.98k £14.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A