ANVIL PROJECTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anvil Projects was formed in 2023. With expertise in community development, education and the creative arts, our projects focus on education and assistance for sanctuary seekers wellbeing and using the arts to enhance communities. We partner with individuals and communities to maximise their potential, increase their wellbeing and promote intercultural awareness and connections.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Hackney
- Luton
- Newham
- Tower Hamlets
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 29 November 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqui Shurr | Chair | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Marlow | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
Susannah Oziegbe | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Lucy Thorne | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Kearney | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, 4.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST SANCTUARY SEEKERS (IDENTIFIED AS; REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS & OTHER DIASPORA WHO MAY BE/HAVE BEEN VULNERABLE THROUGH MIGRATION) INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE TEACHING OF ENGLISH AS A SECOND LANGUAGE; AND FACILITATING THE DEVELOPMENT OF COMPETENCES AND SKILLS IN INDIVIDUALS. 4.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR THROUGH FACILITATING ART EXHIBITIONS AND CREATIVE EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hanbury Hall, 22a Hanbury Street,
LONDON
E1 6QR
- Phone:
- 07855220339
- Email:
- info@anvil-projects.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.