ACTION YEMEN LIMITED

Charity Number: 1206150
Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Humanitarian relief and support of people in Yemen. These beneficiaries would include individuals and families living in poverty and internally displaced people. We aim to provide tangible relief and save lives. We aim to keep children in education and work to to encourage people to become financially independent in an country that is suffering one of the world's worst humanitarian disasters.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Djibouti
  • Egypt
  • Ethiopia
  • Jordan
  • Somalia
  • Turkey
  • Yemen

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 December 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marwan Hamood Trustee 16 February 2025
None on record
Arafat Abdulla Trustee 23 June 2024
None on record
Sameem Rakeeb Trustee 23 June 2024
None on record
Zamzam Essa Trustee 23 June 2024
None on record
ABDUL YAHIA RAKEEB Trustee 27 May 2023
THE BIRMINGHAM MOSQUE TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Action Yemen c/o Darul LLM
Golden Hillock Road
Sparkbrook
BIRMINGHAM
B11 2PY
Phone:
07785555536
Website:

No information available