NORTH LONDON KOREAN SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit to advance the education of children in North London and the surrounding areas who are primarily but not exclusively of Korean background in particular by the operation of a supplementary school focused on Korean language, history, tradition and culture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 November 2023: CIO registration
- NORTH LONDON KOREAN SCHOOL CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUNG PIL MOON | Chair | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
BO KYUNG PARK | Trustee | 11 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
SOO-YEUN DENHAM | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
HEE YEON LEE | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN NORTH LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF KOREAN BACKGROUND IN PARTICULAR BY THE OPERATION OF A SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL FOCUSED ON KOREAN LANGUAGE, HISTORY, TRADITION AND CULTURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 40
Mercury House
Heathcroft
LONDON
W5 3BF
- Phone:
- 07515686787
- Email:
- HEADTEACHER@NLKS.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window