SOUTH MUSKHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity hires out the village hall and seeks to maintain and improve the hall for the benefit of the villagers. The charity is actively involved in fund raising to provide an updated facility for the use of the villagers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 05 December 1963: Standard registration
- SOUTH MUSKHAM AND LITTLE CARLTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carolyn Boswell | Trustee | 27 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE DONNELLY | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fredrick John Lacey | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kim Walsh | Trustee | 08 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dudley Woolnough | Trustee | 13 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STARKEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.18k | £30.76k | £18.23k | £10.83k | £10.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.19k | £27.54k | £18.54k | £17.93k | £11.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 October 2021 | 253 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 25 MAY 1956
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH MUSKHAM AND NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH MUSKHAM AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Dickinson Way
North Muskham
Ng23 6ff
- Phone:
- 07976944289
- Email:
- dudley_woolnough@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
smlcvillagehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window