THE TEVERSAL COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Land held by the Trust includes a car park, outdoor sports facilities, a bowls pavilion, and a visitor centre, hosting four different organisations who utilise the facilities. The Trustee works with the voluntary organisations to provide and maintain the facilities and recreation grounds for the communities of Teversal, Stanton Hill, Skegby and surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 03 June 1964: Standard registration
- TEVERSAL GRANGE (Working name)
- THE TEVERSAL SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashfield District Council | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.46k | £6.58k | £5.67k | £12.86k | £5.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 459 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 459 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 12 APRIL 1989
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF TEVERSAL, STANTON HILL, SKEGBY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
TEVERSAL, STANTON HILL SKEGBY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASHFIELD DISTRICT COUNCIL
URBAN ROAD
KIRKBY-IN-ASHFIELD
NOTTINGHAM
NG17 8DA
- Phone:
- 01623450000
- Email:
- r.dennis@ashfield.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.