THRUMPTON VILLAGE HALL AND SOCIAL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a local venue for social gatherings to promote village life & community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £2,800 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 15 December 1961: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR MARY CARSWELL | Chair | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Catherine Alexandra Millward | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert Webb | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ben Wilson | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.41k | £17.44k | £16.47k | £14.04k | £13.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.28k | £9.33k | £12.01k | £10.64k | £11.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.42k | £12.80k | £9.59k | £2.67k | £2.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 03 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 10/10/1961 AS AMENDED ON 09/12/2008
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
THRUMPTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Church Lane
Thrumpton
Nottingham
NG11 0AX
- Phone:
- 01159830376
- Email:
- TVHSC@thrumpton.org.uk
- Website:
-
thrumpton.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window