ANTIVENOM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Antivenom Foundation is the worlds first international antivenom stockpile, that provides lifesaving antivenoms for those bitten by venomous snakes or stung by scorpions. We use our extensive network to connect clinics to expert doctors and vetted antivenom suppliers, working with our partners on the ground to strengthen the health system and improve care for patients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Algeria
- Botswana
- Eswatini
- Jordan
- Lebanon
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- South Africa
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 31 August 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faisa Price | Chair | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alessia Cacioni | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Swallow | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM ANIMAL ENVENOMATION (VENOM POISONING) IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BY: 1. THE PROVISION OF, OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF, MEDICINES, EQUIPMENT AND SUPPORT SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES; 2. THE UNDERTAKING OF MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO THE TREATMENT OF ANIMAL ENVENOMATION. 3. THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL ADVICE TO THOSE SUFFERING FROM ANIMAL ENVENOMATION; AND 4. ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT ANIMAL ENVENOMATION AND RELATED ISSUES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 SPRING GROVE
GODALMING
GU7 3SS
- Phone:
- 07418023224
- Email:
- info@antivenomfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window