WARSOP VALE MINERS' WELFARE RECREATION GROUND AND INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 28 January 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MANSFIELD DISTRICT COUNCIL | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.90k | £0 | £1.40k | £704 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 March 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07/11/1923 AS VARIED BY DEED OF VARIATIONS DATED 08/07/1929 AND 30/01/1985 AND SCHEME OF 02/05/1984
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A RECREATION GROUND,SPORTS GROUND,VILLAGE HALL AND COMMUNITY CENTRE AND FACILITIES ANCILLARY THERETO FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF MANSFIELD IN THE COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANSFIELD DISTRICT COUNCIL
CIVIC CENTRE
CHESTERFIELD ROAD SOUTH
MANSFIELD
NG19 7BH
- Phone:
- 01623463442
- Email:
- mdc@mansfield.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window