ANIMALS IN REACH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Animals in Reach works with children and young people who are at risk of exclusion from education or struggling to attend through emotionally based school avoidance. Animals in Reach also works with disabled adults and adults with mental health difficulties. This includes but not exclusively, providing therapeutic and educational support through working with animals, horticulture and crafts.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 March 2024: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Hardman | Chair | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Lusty | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Purrington | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Mullen | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
GERALDINE CASSWELL | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Alice McColl | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE JESSICA HASLAM | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS LIVING IN YORKSHIRE WHO ARE SOCIALLY ISOLATED OR HAVE A DISABILITY, NEUROLOGICAL CONDITION, ANXIETY OR ANY OTHER MENTAL HEALTH CONDITION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ANIMAL ASSISTED, HORTICULTURAL AND CRAFT-BASED THERAPIES. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS LIVING IN YORKSHIRE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADDITIONAL SUPPORT TO COMPLETE THEIR SCHOOL WORK AND THE OPPORTUNITY TO PURSUE QUALIFICATIONS IN ANIMAL CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANOR FARM
WEST LUTTON
MALTON NORTH YORKS
YO17 8TA
- Phone:
- +447518747516
- Email:
- info@animalsinreach.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.