Financial history WELBECK MINERS WELFARE TRUST

Charity Number: 522319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £60.01k £60.81k £91.81k £136.66k £167.80k
Total expenditure £61.25k £70.53k £110.09k £135.11k £184.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.63k