CATHOLIC MEDICAL ASSOCIATION (U.K.)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support our Healthcare Professional members in their work, particularly with medico-ethical problems. We respond to national consultations on healthcare matters and publish a quarterly journal. We sponsor educational and social meetings at a national and local level.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 August 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Teresa Lynch | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr STEPHEN ROBERT BRENNAN | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr bruno Bubna-Kasteliz | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION BY THE STUDY AND PROPAGATION OF THE TEACHING OF THE CHURCH AS IT BEARS ON THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF MEDICINE AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR CATHOLIC MEMBERS OF THE HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONS OF GREAT BRITAIN, THE COMMONWEALTH AND OVERSEAS, TO MEET FOR PRAYER AND STUDY; TO PROVIDE THE CHURCH WITH A SOURCE OF INFORMATION ON MEDICO-MORAL MATTERS; TO PROMOTE DISCUSSION AND CO-OPERATION BETWEEN HEALTHCARE DISCIPLINES AND TO UPHOLD THE PRINCIPLES OF CATHOLIC MORALITY IN HEALTHCARE PRACTICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39
Eccleston Square
London
SW1V 1PB
- Phone:
- 02079014895
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.