VILLAGE FORCE AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of VFA are: 1. The relief of financial hardship and relief of need ( water/sanitation, solar power) in socially and economically deprived rural communities initially but not exclusively operating in Zimbabwe. 2.Providing or assisting in the provision of education, training, healthcare and support necessary to generate income and be self-sufficient in rural Zimbabwe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 22 August 2023: CIO registration
- Village Force Africa Trust (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Ann Dawes GGSMCertEd | Chair | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thabani Happiness Mnkandla | Trustee | 05 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Silibaziso Mlotshwa | Trustee | 05 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Baroness Janet Evelyn Fookes | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR MICHAEL DAWES | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
PATINA NAA-OYOO BLANKSON | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael Peter Turnbull | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Jocelyn Margaret Cannings | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Frederick Privett | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND RELIEF OF NEED IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED RURAL COMMUNITIES IN WESTERN TO SOUTHERN ZIMBABWE, PRIMARILY THROUGH GRANT FUNDING. 2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN WESTERN TO SOUTHERN ZIMBABWE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14
Knoll Rise
St. Leonards-on-Sea
East Sussex
Knoll Rise
TN38 0NT
- Phone:
- 07711663139
- Email:
- info@villageforceafrica.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window