2ND GRANTHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To run Beaver, Cub and Scout Groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 07 February 1969: Standard registration
- 2ND GRANTHAM (ST WULFRAMS) SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT ANDREW COX | Chair | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paula Louise Bennett | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Cullen | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Rugg | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Agnieszka Kozlowska | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Rose Fahy | Trustee | 18 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.12k | £29.33k | £17.83k | £11.86k | £19.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.83k | £8.57k | £15.95k | £15.48k | £24.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.67k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED OF 3RD MAY 1968
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2nd Grantham (St. Wulframs) Scout Association
Scout Hut
Broad Street
GRANTHAM
Lincolnshire
NG31 8AP
- Phone:
- 07941588649
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window