HEAD IN THE GAME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and protection of good physical and mental health for the public benefit in particular by providing sports based mental health programmes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £12,310 from 3 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 September 2023: CIO registration
- HEAD IN THE GAME CIC (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Anthony Barclay | Chair | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Hawk | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Dawes | Trustee | 19 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Declan O'Callaghan | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Lloyd | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
KIMBERLEY JANE FOULKES | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.31k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 04 April 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 04 April 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Sep 2023 as amended on 05 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING SPORTS BASED MENTAL HEALTH PROGRAMMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 12
Sparrow Way
Lakesview Business Park
CANTERBURY
Kent
CT3 4AL
- Phone:
- 07507268045
- Email:
- info@headinthegame.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window