GAINSBOROUGH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Camping, Weekly Meetings, Training Activities and indeed, any activity which involves Scouting as authorised by the Scout asociation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 28 March 1963: Standard registration
- GAINSBOROUGH BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- GAINSBOROUGH DISTRICT SCOUTS COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT ALFRED FALL | Chair |
|
||||||
William Hurst | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Ian Middleton | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Terence Moore | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Hartley | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Cole | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Rupert Warburton | Trustee | 23 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Clark | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Fall | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN DAVID SWATTON | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Yvonne Bull | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ALFRED BIRD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.39k | £27.13k | £10.40k | £5.45k | £7.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.76k | £2.95k | £17.64k | £21.82k | £14.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.00k | £8.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 May 2024 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
1. BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1935 2. CONVEYANCE DATED 29TH MARCH 1962 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955.
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE GAINSBOROUGH BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
GAINSBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Trentvale Avenue
GAINSBOROUGH
Lincolnshire
DN21 1ZQ
- Phone:
- 01427678456
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window