CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS, DERBY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a place of worship, providing daily services seven days a week, with the main eucharist service being held on a Sunday morning. We have a number of different aged choirs, from a junior choir, to an adult choir. We host large scale events, both community and commercial events. We are a Cathedral of Sanctuary, providing a safe space for all.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 09 April 2024: Standard registration
- DERBY CATHEDRAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Very Reverend Dr Peter Robinson | Chair | 04 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Gwyneth Ann Shooter | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
THE VENERABLE MATTHEW JOHN HARVEY TRICK | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
TITTERTON MARK JOHN | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
THE HON DAVID PIERS CARLIS LEIGH | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Jane Grahl | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JANUARY 2024 IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CATHEDRALS MEASURE 2021
Charitable objects
"THE OBJECTS OF THE CHAPTER ARE- (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FAITH AND PRACTICE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, IN PARTICULAR BY FURTHERING THE MISSION OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND; (B) TO CARE FOR AND CONSERVE THE FABRIC AND STRUCTURE OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH BUILDING; (C) TO ADVANCE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE ANCILLARY TO THE FURTHERANCE OF THE PURPOSE REFERRED TO IN SUB-PARAGRAPH (A) OR (B). THE CHAPTER MUST ACT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN THE MEANING OF SECTION 4(3) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011".
Contact information
- Address:
-
DERBY CATHEDRAL CHAPTER
18-19 IRON GATE
DERBY
DE1 3GP
- Phone:
- 01332341201
- Email:
- office@derbycathedral.org
- Website:
-
derbycathedral.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.