LINCOLN DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide spiritual guidance and support to over 1500 young people of all abilities and religions from the ages of 4 to 25 years. Encourage teamwork and personal development through a wide range of activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
550 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 12 February 1964: Standard registration
- 23 May 2024: Funds received from 522386 16TH LINCOLN (ST NICHOLAS) SCOUT GROUP
- LINCOLN AND DISTRICT BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE JACKSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew McGuire | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Hadleigh | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Danielle Mountain | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee William Evans | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Grant Ashley | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Duncan Campbell | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.25k | £133.79k | £164.59k | £153.76k | £212.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.42k | £102.87k | £138.21k | £155.36k | £201.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £50.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 September 2024 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 September 2024 | 218 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
A) CONVEYANCE DATED 8TH APRIL 1958 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955 B) DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21ST MARCH 1949
Charitable objects
LINCOLN AND DISTRICT BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
LINCOLN AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Altham Terrace
Lincoln
Lincolnshire
LN5 8DN
- Phone:
- 07548986149
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window